WA HB2746 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Refinancing of medicaid personal care services for individuals with developmental disabilities and individuals with long-term care needs through the community first choice option.
Title
Refinancing of medicaid personal care services for individuals with developmental disabilities and individuals with long-term care needs through the community first choice option.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-31 | House | Chapter 166, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 7:30 PM. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |