WA HB2724 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unemployment compensation for musicians.
Title
Concerning unemployment compensation for musicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-29 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Same As/Similar To
SB6521 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-31 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.