WA HB2722 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning persons appointed by the court to provide information in family law and adoption cases.
Title
Concerning persons appointed by the court to provide information in family law and adoption cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |