WA HB2718 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning seizure and forfeiture procedures and reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning seizure and forfeiture procedures and reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-23SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-22SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-22SenateLAW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2018-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-13HouseFloor amendment
2018-02-13House2nd substitute bill substituted
2018-02-13HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-24HouseJUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback