WA HB2692 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the minimum monthly salary paid to Washington state patrol troopers and sergeants.
Title
Concerning the minimum monthly salary paid to Washington state patrol troopers and sergeants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | House | Chapter 140, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |