WA HB2691 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Central Washington University's fifth year promise.
Title
Concerning Central Washington University's fifth year promise.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-03 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |