WA HB2681 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing pharmacists to prescribe and dispense contraceptives.
Title
Authorizing pharmacists to prescribe and dispense contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 132, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2016-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-11 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-09 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |