WA HB2680 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a caterer's license to sell spirits, beer, and wine.
Title
Establishing a caterer's license to sell spirits, beer, and wine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-17 | House | Chapter 29, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | OVER - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight |