WA HB2667 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning administrative processes of the state parks and recreation commission that require a majority vote of the commission.
Title
Concerning administrative processes of the state parks and recreation commission that require a majority vote of the commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Jessyn Farrell [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
Rep. Terry Nealey [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Scott [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 103, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2016-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-03-08 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | CB - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2016-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-01 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |