WA HB2658 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of perfluorinated chemicals in food packaging.
Title
Concerning the use of perfluorinated chemicals in food packaging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | House | Chapter 138, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-12 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2018-02-12 | House | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB6396 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.