WA HB2644 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning animal forfeiture in animal cruelty cases.
Title
Concerning animal forfeiture in animal cruelty cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. JD Rossetti [D] |
Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 181, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2016-02-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |