WA HB2638 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a graduated reentry program of partial confinement for certain offenders.
Title
Creating a graduated reentry program of partial confinement for certain offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 166, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2018-02-26 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
Same As/Similar To
SB6277 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.