WA HB2624 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending the interstate compact for adult offender supervision.
Title
Suspending the interstate compact for adult offender supervision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Human Services. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |