WA HB2583 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding charter school chief executive officers to the list of individuals who may file complaints of unprofessional conduct regarding certificated employees.
Title
Adding charter school chief executive officers to the list of individuals who may file complaints of unprofessional conduct regarding certificated employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Education |