WA HB2580 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning secondary career and technical education courses.
Title
Concerning secondary career and technical education courses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-20 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-19 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2010-03-17 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | HEWD - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Education. | |
2010-01-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |