WA HB2573 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the department of licensing to conduct a review of the need for regulation of theatrical wrestling events.
Title
Requiring the department of licensing to conduct a review of the need for regulation of theatrical wrestling events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |