WA HB2563 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring retailers to post the total sale price of spirits for sale.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring retailers to post the total sale price of spirits for sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-02-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-08HouseFloor amendment
2018-02-08House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-29HouseCOG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-23HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-22HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-18HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM.
2018-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-10HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback