WA HB2558 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the joint legislative task force on jail standards.
Title
Establishing the joint legislative task force on jail standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-05 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |