WA HB2555 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the department of labor and industries to issue subpoenas to enforce production of information related to electricians and electrical installations.
Title
Authorizing the department of labor and industries to issue subpoenas to enforce production of information related to electricians and electrical installations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Chapter 55, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-15 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-26 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-01-05 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6492 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.