WA HB2544 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of veteran.
Title
Concerning the definition of veteran.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Jeremie Dufault [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] |
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 178, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |