WA HB2512 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning nonresident surplus line brokers and insurance producers.
Title
Concerning nonresident surplus line brokers and insurance producers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-25 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | FII - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | FII - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6251 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-10 - Effective date 7/26/2010.