WA HB2450 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adopting the Washington small rechargeable battery stewardship act.
Title
Adopting the Washington small rechargeable battery stewardship act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-03 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations & Oversight at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-02-02 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations & Oversight at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to General Government Appropriations & Oversight. | |
2012-01-31 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-01-31 | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-31 | ENVI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-31 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-13 | First reading, referred to Environment. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6148 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.