WA HB2450 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning clarification and expansion of eligibility to use the state's local government investment pool.
Title
Concerning clarification and expansion of eligibility to use the state's local government investment pool.
Sponsors
Sen. John McCoy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-21 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-12-09 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6221 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-31 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2450&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2450.pdf |