WA HB2445 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the leasing authority of the state parks and recreation commission.
Title
Concerning the leasing authority of the state parks and recreation commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-20 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-26 | House | ICEV - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
79a | 05 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79a | 05 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |