WA HB2444 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the reference to the standard industrial classification system in the worker and community right to know fund.
Title
Eliminating the reference to the standard industrial classification system in the worker and community right to know fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 168, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-26 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Same As/Similar To
SB6231 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.