WA HB2437 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging investments in affordable and supportive housing.
Title
Encouraging investments in affordable and supportive housing.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:30 PM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |