WA HB2437 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning election year restrictions on state legislators.
Title
Concerning election year restrictions on state legislators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-20 | House | SG - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2437&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2437.pdf |