WA HB2436 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the public employees' benefits board benefits account.
Title
Creating the public employees' benefits board benefits account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-27 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-27 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB6346 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-22 - First reading, referred to Health Care.