WA HB2430 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning athletic trainers.
Title
Concerning athletic trainers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-02 | House | Chapter 194, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-03 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 6:00 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |