WA HB2429 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the resale of motor vehicles previously determined as having nonconformities.
Title
Addressing the resale of motor vehicles previously determined as having nonconformities.
Sponsors
Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Rep. Deborah Eddy [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Rep. Allister O'Brien [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
Rep. Alex Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Chapter 31, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-12 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-05 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | Referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2010-02-19 | And refer to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2010-02-19 | TRAN - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |