WA HB2416 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning correctional industries' insurance costs.
Title
Concerning correctional industries' insurance costs.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2016-02-03 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |