WA HB2406 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing employment noncompetition agreements.
Title
Addressing employment noncompetition agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Manweller [R] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-26 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-02 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2406&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2406.pdf |