WA HB2391 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning county ferries.
Title
Concerning county ferries.
Sponsors
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Joe Timmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-20 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-26 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 54 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 04 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |