WA HB2390 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating opioid medications at educational institutions.
Title
Regulating opioid medications at educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-25 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6469 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-18 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.