WA HB2380 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Effective date 4/18/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Effective date 4/18/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the supplemental capital budget.
Title
Concerning the supplemental capital budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Effective date 4/18/2016. |
2016-04-18 | House | Chapter 35, 2016 Laws 1st Special Session PV. |
2016-04-18 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2016-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2016-03-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2016-03-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2016-03-28 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
Same As/Similar To
SB6201 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.