WA HB2375 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning cybercrime.
Title
Concerning cybercrime.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 164, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-16 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | GGIT - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2016-01-29 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
Same As/Similar To
SB6197 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.