WA HB2369 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning regulation of permanent cosmetics under the Washington body art, body piercing, and tattooing act.
Title
Concerning regulation of permanent cosmetics under the Washington body art, body piercing, and tattooing act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-16 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-16 | House | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |