WA HB2363 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the use of unmanned aircraft to deliver contraband.
Title
Addressing the use of unmanned aircraft to deliver contraband.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-01-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-01-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-18 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |