WA HB2362 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing local transportation revenue options.
Title
Addressing local transportation revenue options.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6652 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2362&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2362.pdf |