WA HB2354 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the dairy inspection program assessment expiration date.
Title
Extending the dairy inspection program assessment expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPG - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology. |
2014-01-28 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-28 | House | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB6079 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2354&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2354.pdf |