WA HB2344 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning evacuation of adult family homes.
Title
Concerning evacuation of adult family homes.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 6:00 PM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-01-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-16 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-10 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2017-12-29 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6112 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.