WA HB2341 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning indecent liberties by a clergy member.
Title
Concerning indecent liberties by a clergy member.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-18 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |