WA HB2330 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning primacy of insurance coverage.
Title
Concerning primacy of insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Bill Hinkle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-04 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-04-01 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2330&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2330.pdf |