WA HB2323 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington achieving a better life experience program.
Title
Creating the Washington achieving a better life experience program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-29 | House | Chapter 39, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2016-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass ELHS 16 bill proposed by Early Learning & Human Services. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-19 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2015-12-24 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6210 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.