WA HB2320 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adult family homes.
Title
Concerning adult family homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-02-03 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 6:00 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |