WA HB2316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning fees charged to persons who commit trafficking and prostitution offenses.
Title
Concerning fees charged to persons who commit trafficking and prostitution offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-23 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |