WA HB2310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing emissions from vehicles associated with on-demand transportation services.
Title
Reducing emissions from vehicles associated with on-demand transportation services.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6399 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.