WA HB2307 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning fireworks prohibitions adopted by cities or counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning fireworks prohibitions adopted by cities or counties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-01-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-24HouseLG - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2020-01-08HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback