WA HB2302 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the pesticide application safety committee.
Title
Extending the pesticide application safety committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Joe Timmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-30 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6166 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.