WA HB2301 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-18 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-18 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the appropriation to counties of moneys from the dedicated marijuana account for the purpose of funding legal services for indigent defendants in criminal cases.
Title
Concerning the appropriation to counties of moneys from the dedicated marijuana account for the purpose of funding legal services for indigent defendants in criminal cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Joyce McDonald [R] |
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2301&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2301.pdf |